Woodsford, Mathew Noel (CPSO#: 105214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#7-101 Lakeport Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L7
Phone: (905) 934-1666
Fax: (905) 934-2595
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATHEW NOEL WOODSFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODSFORD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2015