Woodside, Donald William (CPSO#: 22552)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Mar 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009