Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Woodside, Scott Macdonald (CPSO#: 65338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sexual Behaviours Clinic
Centre for Addiciton and Mental
Health
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34708
Fax: (416) 979-6965
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queen Street Treatment Clinic
Toronto ON  M6J 1J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 538-3839
Fax: (416) 538-8738
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Woodside Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Woodside ( CPSO# 65338 )

Business Address:
Sexual Behaviours Clinic
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 979-4708

Business Address:
Queen Street Treatment Clinic
1194 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1J6
Phone Number: (416) 538-3839

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT MACDONALD WOODSIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODSIDE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993