Woodward, Peter Scott (CPSO#: 56898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811 Ext. 3021
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter S. Woodward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Woodward ( CPSO# 56898 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER SCOTT WOODWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODWARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1987