Woolf, Stephen Maurice (CPSO#: 27194)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Oct 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1981
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Oct 2006

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 12, 2006
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As from October 12, 2006, Dr. Stephen Maurice Woolf undertakes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario the following:

1. I, Stephen Maurice Woolf, hereby resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.

2. I promise not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

3. I consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered in the register as information that is available to the public.

4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario has agreed to withdraw the allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence that are currently pending before the Discipline Committee.

5. I have obtained independent legal advice before giving this undertaking.