Woolfrey, Michael Richard (CPSO#: 63967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5894
Fax: (519) 751-5895
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Woolfrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Woolfrey ( CPSO# 64112 )
Dr. M. Woolfrey ( CPSO# 63967 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5894

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Jul 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 5, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael Richard
            Woolfrey, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Woolfrey
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. MICHAEL RICHARD WOOLFREY
                                          ("Dr. Woolfrey")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                  (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of
                  Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule "A"; and
                  the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".                                                
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, certificate of registration number 63967, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that the College received information from
                  the NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215641 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective immediately upon the signing of this Undertaking.

            (5)   Practice Restriction, Prescribing Log and Copies of Prescriptions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake that I shall not prescribe Narcotic
                        Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
                        Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs for chronic
                        non-cancer pain.
                  
                  (b)   Notwithstanding paragraph (5)(a), I, Dr. Woolfrey, may:
                  
                        i.    prescribe the above-noted medications for acute post-injury,
                              post-fracture or post-surgical pain; and 
                  
                        ii.   write hospital orders for the above-noted medications for
                              hospital in-patients during the course of their in-patient
                              stay to be dispensed through the hospital pharmacy only.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic
                  Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, excluding hospital
                  orders for these medications made in accordance with paragraph (5)(b)(ii)
                  of this Undertaking, in the form attached as set out in Schedule "D",
                  which will include at least the following information (the "Prescribing
                  Log"):  

                        (i)   the date of the patient encounter;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether Dr. Woolfrey has prescribed this medication and/or
                              another Narcotic Drug, Narcotic Preparation, Controlled Drug,
                              Benzodiazepine or Other Targeted Substance to this patient
                              for a consecutive duration exceeding three (3) months (Y/N); 
                        (vi)  Dr. Woolfrey's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out below).
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write
                  for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored
                  Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of nine (9) months on the terms set
                        out below (the "Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that the purpose of the Clinical
                        Supervision is to ensure that I am in compliance with my Practice
                        Restriction as set out at paragraph 5 of this Undertaking and that
                        my prescribing of Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                        Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs for acute post-injury, post-fracture or
                        post-surgical pain is appropriate.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of
                        Clinical Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon
                        recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the
                        College.
                  
                  Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of Clinical
                        Supervision for a minimum of three (3) months on the terms set out
                        below.
                  
                  (e)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every month to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if there are not 15 patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, then the charts of all patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                  
                        ii.   the chart of every patient to whom I have prescribed a
                              Narcotic Drug, Narcotic Preparation, Controlled Drug,
                              Benzodiazepine and/or Other Targeted Substance and/or any
                              other Monitored Drug for a consecutive duration exceeding
                              three (3) months.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) have reviewed and discussed
                        with me;
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that after a minimum of three (3)
                        months of Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that
                        I have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in
                        a less highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may recommend to the College that supervision be reduced. 
                  
                  
                  Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")
                  
                  (i)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to engage in Phase 2 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of six (6) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (j)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every three (3) months to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if there are not 15 patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, then the charts of all patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                  
                        ii.   the chart of every patient to whom I have prescribed a
                              Narcotic Drug, Narcotic Preparation, Controlled Drug,
                              Benzodiazepine and/or Other Targeted Substance and/or any
                              other Monitored Drug for a consecutive duration exceeding
                              three (3) months. 
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) have reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every three (3) months.
                  
                  (m)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that after a minimum of six (6) months
                        of Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have
                        the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice without
                        supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to the
                        College that the Clinical Supervision cease.
                  
                  (n)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                        Supervision will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (p)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        location approved by the College;
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report of the medical inspector dated February 21, 2017, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        reasonable recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including
                        but not limited to, any reasonable recommended practice
                        improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (s)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        thirty (30) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (u)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (8)(s) and/or (t)
                        above, I will cease prescribing narcotic drugs, narcotic
                        preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted
                        substances, and all other monitored drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (v)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs,
                        benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and all other
                        monitored drugs as a result of section (8)(u) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   In the course of this investigation, I, Dr. Woolfrey, voluntarily
                        enrolled in the University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program
                        in Safe Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                        workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Schedule "F", including but not limited to, the following elements
                        of professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                        (ii)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                  
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
                  
                              3.    CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                    https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
                                    and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the Clinical Supervision set out under section 8 of the
                        Undertaking has ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my
                        practice by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                        "Reassessment").

                  (b)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge and agree that the focus of the
                        Reassessment shall be on ensuring that I am in compliance with my
                        Practice Restriction as set out at paragraph 5 of this Undertaking
                        and that my prescribing of Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                        Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and
                        All other Monitored Drugs for acute post-injury, post-fracture or
                        post-surgical pain is appropriate.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview
                        of me, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the terms of this Undertaking 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (17)  I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Woolfrey, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with the section above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring
                        System about Dr. Woolfrey's prescribing of controlled substances,
                        including narcotics.
                  
                        Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                        investigation into whether Dr. Woolfrey failed to maintain the
                        standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in
                        his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.  As
                        a result of the investigation:
                  
                        Dr. Woolfrey shall not prescribe Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs for chronic non-cancer
                        pain.
                  
                        Notwithstanding this restriction, Dr. Woolfrey may:
                  
                              prescribe the above-noted medications for acute post-injury,
                              post fracture or post-surgical pain; and 
                  
                              write hospital orders for the above-noted medications for
                              hospital in-patients during the course of their in-patient
                              stay to be dispensed through the hospital pharmacy only.
                  
                              Dr. Woolfrey's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic
                              preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other
                              targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be
                              supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                              for a minimum of nine (9) months. 
                  
                              Dr. Woolfrey will engage in professional education in the
                              prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.
                  
                              Following the professional education and period of
                              supervision, Dr. Woolfrey's prescribing of controlled
                              substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an
                              assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Woolfrey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Woolfrey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Woolfrey, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael Richard Woolfrey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 5, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Woolfrey’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Woolfrey failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Woolfrey shall not prescribe Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs for chronic non-cancer pain.

Notwithstanding this restriction, Dr. Woolfrey may:

prescribe the above-noted medications for acute post-injury, post fracture or post-surgical pain; and

write hospital orders for the above-noted medications for hospital in-patients during the course of their in-patient stay to be dispensed through the hospital pharmacy only.

Dr. Woolfrey’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of nine (9) months.

Dr. Woolfrey will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Woolfrey’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.