Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Woolfson, Ian Kenneth (CPSO#: 52037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 5435
Fax: (905) 721-6665
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Woolfson ( CPSO# 52037 )

Business Address:
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN KENNETH WOOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLFSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1984