Woolfson, Neil Benjamin (CPSO#: 63020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Surgical Associates
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone: (905) 820-3633
Fax: (905) 820-3352
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bard Moffat Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2017


Corporation Name: Neil Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Woolfson ( CPSO# 63020 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Surgical Associates
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone Number: (905) 820-3633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL BENJAMIN WOOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLFSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1995