Woolhouse, Susan Jennifer (CPSO#: 76517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Riverdale Community
Health Centre
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone: (416) 461-2493 Ext. 848
Fax: (416) 461-8245
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

208 Oakwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6E 2V4
Canada
Phone: 416-469-9754
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN JENNIFER WOOLHOUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLHOUSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2003