Woollam, Robin Charles (CPSO#: 29776)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 05 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Feb 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 05 Feb 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Feb 2014
Summary:

On February 5, 2014, Dr. Woollam pleaded no contest to and the Discipline Committee found 
that Dr. Woollam committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in sexual 
abuse of a patient and in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regardded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional. Dr. Woollam admitted and the Discipline 
Committee found that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to 
practice. 
 
Dr. Woollam was criminally charged on October 16, 2009 with sexual assault against Patient A, 
contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code. He was convicted on November 24, 2010. Dr. 
Woollam received a twelve month conditional sentence, followed by probation for a term of one 
year. Dr. Woollam s practice has been restricted to male patients since January 5, 2011. Dr. 
Woollam unsuccessfully appealed the decision to the Divisional Court and to the Court of 
Appeal for Ontario. A panel of three judges of the Court of Appeal issued their reasons 
dismissing leave to appeal on November 21, 2013. 
 
At the time of the incident Patient A was 21 years old. She had been a patient of Dr. Woollam s 
since 2005. Patient A was experiencing issues with kidney stones and ovarian cysts around the 
time of the incident. During a follow up examination with respect to her cysts, Dr. Woollam 
palpated her upper abdomen and checked her ovaries then began rubbing her stomach and talking 
to her. Dr. Woollam put his hand under her pants and underwear and began moving his fingers in 
a back and forth motion on her labia and clitoris. Dr. Woollam also touched her breast. Patient A 
described being scared and silent. Dr. Woollam told her that he was attracted to her and asked if 
she wanted to take things further. Patient A indicated that she did not and Dr. Woollam 
apologized repeatedly. Patient A told Dr. Woollam that he had crossed the line. 
 
The Discipline Committe ordered and directed that: 
      the Registrar revoke Dr. Woollam s certificate of registration, effective immediately 
      Dr. Woollam attend before the panel to be reprimanded 
      Dr. Woollam reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program 
      required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other 
      security acceptable to the College by May 5, 2014, in the amount of $16,060.00 
      Dr. Wollam pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within ninty (90) days of the 
      date of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 5, 2014

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 14, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Woollam’s certificate of registration was revoked on February 5, 2014 following findings by the Discipline Committee including sexual abuse of a patient.

Dr. Woollam was referred to the Discipline Committee with respect to further allegations including sexual abuse and disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct. These allegations were not proven before the Discipline Committee.

Dr. Woollam has undertaken to never apply for reinstatement as a physician in Ontario or in any other jurisdiction. As a result of this undertaking, the College has withdrawn these further allegations.