Wooltorton, Eric John (CPSO#: 73633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Wooltorton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Wooltorton ( CPSO# 73633 )

Business Address:
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K0A 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 761-4334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC JOHN WOOLTORTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLTORTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2001