Wooster, Douglas Lawrence (CPSO#: 30786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1202
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 516-4399
Fax: (416) 516-1704
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS LAWRENCE WOOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOSTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1979