Worling, Robert Vickery (CPSO#: 15412)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996