Worrall, James Christopher (CPSO#: 76162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Emergency Department
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4773
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Worrall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Worrall ( CPSO# 76162 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Emergency Department
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4773

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 761-4773

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES CHRISTOPHER WORRALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORRALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2003