Worster, Andrew Simon (CPSO#: 63790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Emergency Medicine
2nd Floor McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75848
Fax: (905) 577-8457
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Addiction Treatment Centre
150 Main Street
Cambridge ON  N1R 8H6
Phone: (519) 624-6311
Fax: (519) 624-7044
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Worster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2006

Dr. A. Worster ( CPSO# 63790 )

Business Address:
Ontario Addiction Treatment Centre
150 Main Street
Cambridge ON  N1R 6P9
Phone Number: (519) 624-6311

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ANDREW SIMON WORSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORSTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992