Worthy, Robert Jon (CPSO#: 89360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Athens Family Health Team
9 Wellington E
Athens ON  K0E 1B0
Phone: (613) 924-2623
Fax: (613) 924-2276
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

945 Gardeners Rd
Urgent Care Centre
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Canada
Phone: (613) 389-3348
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.J. Worthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Worthy ( CPSO# 89360 )

Business Address:
Athens Family Health Team
9 Wellington East
Athens ON  K0E 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 924-2623

Business Address:
Family Medicine Urgent Care Centre
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Phone Number: (613) 389-3348

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JON WORTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORTHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012