Worton, Katharine Sarah (CPSO#: 69659)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 1997 to 29 Apr 1997
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998