Wortsman, Arthur Jay (CPSO#: 32960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Nov 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1981


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical Diagnostic
Imaging, Suite 301,
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-6861
Fax: 905 773 2161
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

593 st. clements ave
Toronto ON  M5N1M5
Phone: (905) 773-6861
Fax: (905) 773-2161
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Wortsman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2006

Dr. A. Wortsman ( CPSO# 32960 )

Business Address:
Oak Ridges Medical Diagnostic Imaging
Suite 301
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-6861


Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ARTHUR JAY WORTSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORTSMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1981