Wortsman, Noah Jonathon (CPSO#: 103443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

323 Forest Ave N
Orillia ON  L3V 6Y2
Canada
Phone: (705) 345-8912
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Wortsman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wortsman ( CPSO# 103443)
Dr. A. Shemilt ( CPSO# 108308)

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOAH JONATHON WORTSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORTSMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2015