Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Woulfe, John Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 67777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13345
Fax: (613) 761-4199
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lalonde Woulfe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lalonde ( CPSO# 63137 )
Dr. J. Woulfe ( CPSO# 67777 )

Business Address:
Carleton University Health and Counselling Service
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: (613) 520-6674

Business Address:
Department of Pathology
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL JOSEPH WOULFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOULFE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1998