Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wright, Caroline Cecil (CPSO#: 18881)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 21 Dec 1987
Summary:

 On December 21, 1987, the Fitness to Practice Committee finds that Dr. Wright is an incapacitated 
 member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to clause 62(1)(b) of the 
 Health Disciplines Act.  

As a term and condition of Dr. Wright(s licence, she will execute and 
 fulfill the following Acknowledgement and Undertaking:

1.	that she practice medicine in a private 
 medical practice, consisting of a family practice restricted to psychotherapy and be monitored by 
 a colleague licenced by the College who shall file yearly reports to the College; and that she 
 notify this colleague of any signs or symptoms of an approaching manic or depressive episode 
 forthwith;

2.	that she not change the nature of her practice without written permission from the 
 College;

3.	that she may practice part-time in an institutional setting, other than the Huronia 
 Regional Centre, provided that she notify the Registrar of any part-time institutional work and 
 arrange for a monitor who is acceptable to the Registrar, who shall file yearly reports to the 
 College;

4.	that she undergo treatment with a psychiatrist every three months who is acceptable 
 to the Registrar who shall file yearly reports to the College;

5. 	if at any time she does not 
 have an associate or a psychiatrist who fulfills the criteria, she agrees to cease practicing 
 until the matter is remedied.

Appeal: No Appeal