Wright, Cheryl Lynn (CPSO#: 60911)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Laboratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004