Wright, David Charles (CPSO#: 65634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
161 Hume Rd
RR#1
Puslinch ON  N0B2J0
Phone: (519) 836-6385
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Wright and Dr. Elizabeth Reade Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wright ( CPSO# 65634 )
Dr. E. Reade ( CPSO# 51476 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1992