Wright, Frances Catriona (CPSO#: 70136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room T2-057
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4210
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frances Wright Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Wright ( CPSO# 70136 )

Business Address:
Department of Surgical Oncology
Sunnybrook Regional Cancer Centre
T2-057 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCES CATRIONA WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001