Wright, James Gardner (CPSO#: 53303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nuffield Orthopaedic Centre
Windmill Road
Headington OX3 7LD
United Kingdom
Phone: 441865223721

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Please contact the Orthopedic division at The Hospital for Sick Children at 416 813 6433 for inquiries.
Date Received: 21 Sep 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES GARDNER WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 1982 to 01 Oct 1982
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1988