Wright, James Robert (CPSO#: 62517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James R. Wright Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wright ( CPSO# 62517 )

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 20 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ROBERT WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1991