Wright, Leslie Curtis (CPSO#: 66939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
265 Yorkland Boulevard
North York ON  M2J 1S5
Phone: (416) 229-2399
Fax: (416) 229-9771
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE CURTIS WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Wright’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Wright engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician in his communications, including electronic communications, with women.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Hearing Date: February 21, 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 13, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Findings:

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.
The following sets out finding(s) of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

Leslie C WRIGHT has been convicted of operating a motor vehicle while his ability to operate a motor vehicle was impaired by alcohol contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. A probation order was made against Dr. Wright on November 13, 2015 for a period of 18 months. Dr. Wright is prohibited from operating a motor vehicle on any street, road, highway or other public place for a period of 2 years from November 13, 2015. Dr. Wright was also ordered to pay a fine of $3000, plus a victim surcharge of $900, to be paid within 6 months.