Wright, Stefanie Tara Bennett (CPSO#: 69959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1998


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Dupont Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2G9
Phone: (519) 883-8581
Fax: (519) 883-7192
Electoral District: 03


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. STEFANIE TARA BENNETT WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1998