Wrigley, Frederic Robert Holland (CPSO#: 23176)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999