Wristen, Moira Elizabeth (CPSO#: 63391)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 14 May 1991 to 11 Jun 1991
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2017