Writer, Hilary Kathryn (CPSO#: 61272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Div'n of Paediatric Critical Care
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2887
Fax: (613) 738-4287
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILARY KATHRYN WRITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRITER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003