Wroblewski, Karol Cezary (CPSO#: 81545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120 Ext. 34567
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karol Wroblewski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wroblewski ( CPSO# 81545 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAROL CEZARY WROBLEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WROBLEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2007