Wroz, Paul Wroblewicz Kristofer (CPSO#: 69980)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: Kristofer, Paul Wroblewicz (used until: 03 Jul 2001 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2001