Wu, Alwin (CPSO#: 71270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
First Markham Place
3255 Highway 7 East
Unit 176
Markham ON  L3R 3P9
Phone: (905) 940-4820
Fax: (905) 940-4821
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALWIN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999