Wu, Arthur (CPSO#: 27981)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 22 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1452 Lakeshore Road East, Oakville, ON L6J 1L9
Date Received: 19 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2015