Wu, Bennet Pak-Yeuk (CPSO#: 29831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Nov 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Iroquois Falls Family Health Team
58A Anson Dr.
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone: (705) 258-2818
Fax: (705) 258-2828
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1990
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 26 Jun 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2002
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 26 Sep 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2008
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Aug 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2008 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  April 1, 2008, by Order of the Discipline Committee of the College of
            Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Ontario,  the  following  terms,  conditions and
            limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by  Dr.  Bennet
            Pak-Yeuk Wu:

                  a)    Dr.  Wu will enroll and participate in the Physician Health Program
                        for  co-dependency   counseling   and  support  for  twelve  months
                        following the date of this Order;
                  
                  b)    Dr. Wu will undergo, at his own expense  and  within four months of
                        the date of this Order, a PREP assessment and will  abide by any of
                        its restrictions or recommendations;
                  
                  c)    For a period of twelve months following the date of this Order, Dr.
                        Wu will see a family physician acceptable to the College  a minimum
                        of  once  every  two  months and will continue with such counseling
                        program as is prescribed  and  /or  recommended  by this physician.
                        This  family physician will report to the College once  every  four
                        months to confirm that Dr. Wu is complying with this requirement or
                        immediately if he has any concerns that Dr. Wu has failed to comply
                        with this  Order  or  with  the  restrictions on his certificate of
                        registration and will sign an undertaking  to  that effect with the
                        College.
                  
            As  from  12:00  p.m.,  June  26, 2002, the following terms and conditions  and
            limitations are imposed on Dr.  Bennet  P. Wu's certificate of registration, by
            order of the Discipline Committee of the  College of Physicians and Surgeons of
            Ontario:

            1)    That Dr. Wu be restricted from prescribing  any  controlled substances as
                  defined  by  the  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,  1996,  being  any
                  substance included in Schedule I, II, III, IV, or V of that Act:

            2)    That Dr. Wu see a psychiatrist  acceptable  to  the College for two years
                  and that the psychiatrist provide written reports every six (6) months to
                  the College and sign an undertaking acceptable to the College;

            3)    That  Dr. Wu's family physician provide written reports  to  the  College
                  every three  (3)  months for two years and sign an undertaking acceptable
                  to the College;

            4)    In the event that Wu  breaches  the  terms  of the Discipline Committee's
                  order   by   prescribing,  either  directly  or  indirectly,   controlled
                  substances to his wife, his certificate of registration shall immediately
                  be suspended for a period of six months.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Apr 2008
Summary:

On April 1, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Bennet Pak-Yeuk committed acts of professional misconduct in that he 
has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional.    The Discipline Committee ordered the following: 
  
 
      1.    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Wu s certificate of 
            registration for a period of three months, to commence on May 1, 2008. 
 
      2.    The Discipline Committee directs that the following terms, conditions and 
            limitations be imposed on Dr. Wu s certificate of registration:  
 
            a)      Dr. Wu will enroll and participate in the Physician Health Program for 
                  co-dependency counseling and support for twelve months following the 
                  date of this Order;  
 
            b)      Dr. Wu will undergo, at his own expense and within four months of the 
                  date of this Order, a PREP assessment and will abide by any of its 
                  restrictions or recommendations;  
 
            c)    For a period of twelve months following the date of this Order, Dr. Wu 
                  will see a family physician acceptable to the College who has signed an 
                  undertaking with the College to report to the College once every four 
                  months to confirm that Dr. Wu is complying with this requirement or 
                  immediately if he has any concerns that Dr. Wu has failed to comply with 
                  this Order or with the restrictions on his certificate of registration.  Dr. 
                  Wu will see this family physician a minimum of once every two months.  
                  Dr. Wu will continue with such counseling program as is prescribed and/or 
                  recommended by this physician. 
 
      3.    The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in 
            the register. 
 
Therefore, the Certificate of Registration in the Province of Ontario issued in the name of Dr. 
Bennet Pak-Yeuk is suspended effective May 1, 2008 at 12:01 a.m. and the terms, conditions and 
limitations are effective, April 1, 2008 at 5:00 p.m. 
 
  
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 01, 2008


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Jun 2002
Summary:

On June 26, 2002, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario, having found Dr. Bennet Pak-Yeuk Wu committed an act of professional misconduct   
for an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional, directed, inter alia, that: 
 
1.    Dr. Wu attend before this panel to be reprimanded and the reprimand be recorded on the 
      register. 
 
2.    The results of this proceeding be included in the register 
 
3.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Wu s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, 
      five (5) months of which are to be suspended if Dr. Wu successfully completes an ethics 
      course acceptable to the College within a specified time. 
 
4.    The one-month period of net suspension shall be commenced within 60 days of the date 
      of this order; 
 
5.    The Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wu s 
      certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time and to include the terms, 
      conditions and limitations in the register: 
 
      (a)   that Dr. Wu be restricted from prescribing any controlled substances as defined by 
            the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, 1996, being any substance included in 
            Schedule I, II, III, IV, or V of that Act; 
 
      (b)   that Dr. Wu see a psychiatrist acceptable to the College for a two (2) year period, 
            who will provide written reports to the College every six (6) months for two (2) 
            years; 
 
      (c)   that Dr. Wu s family physician provide written reports to the College every three 
            (3) months for a two (2) year period 
 
      (d)   that Dr. Wu obtain signed Undertakings to report to the College in a form 
            acceptable to the College from the psychiatrist and family physician referred to in 
            6(b) and (c) within 30 days from the date of this order; and 
 
      (e)   that in the event that Dr. Wu breaches the terms of this order by prescribing either 
            directly or indirectly, controlled substances to his wife, his certificate of 
            registration shall be immediately suspended for a period of six (6) months. 
 
 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 26, 2002