Wu, Clara Qianqian (CPSO#: 108850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 2018

Expiry Date:  04 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Elective as of 02 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARA QIANQIAN WU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WU is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. WU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WU shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times: when Dr. WU is no longer enrolled in the postgraduate medical education program for which the certificate is issued; when Dr. WU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada); or when fifteen weeks have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 04 May 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Jun 2016 to 01 Jul 2016
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Sep 2016 to 21 Oct 2016
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2016 to 20 Nov 2016
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2016 to 18 Dec 2016
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 12 Feb 2018 to 23 Feb 2018
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Feb 2018 to 09 Mar 2018
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

McMaster University, 02 Apr 2018 to 15 Apr 2018
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 16 Apr 2018 to 04 May 2018
Elective Trainee - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 May 2018