Wu, Cynthia Mung Jueng (CPSO#: 81924)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 20 Sep 2004 to 17 Oct 2004
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2010