Wu, George Gettin (CPSO#: 52031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Professional Building
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 501
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-8770
Fax: (905) 820-3703
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George G Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wu ( CPSO# 52031 )

Business Address:
501 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-8770

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE GETTIN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1983