Wu, Gilbert Kar Po (CPSO#: 77683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B8
Phone: (905) 237-7415
Fax: (905) 237-7416
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Heart Care Diagnostic Centre
302 - 10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-7415
Fax: (905) 237-7416
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gilbert K.P. Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wu ( CPSO# 77683 )

Business Address:
302 - 10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B8
Phone Number: (905) 237-7415

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILBERT KAR PO WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006