Wu, Grace Chung-Yan (CPSO#: 74811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 725-9374
Fax: (613) 725-9195
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grace Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wu ( CPSO# 74811 )

Business Address:
Suite 308
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 725-9374

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACE CHUNG-YAN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2004