Wu, Henry Mou Wai (CPSO#: 28704)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Henry Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Hillside Medical Centre 520 Ellesmere Road Unit 403 Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017