Wu, Hing-Tung Tony (CPSO#: 30054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 06 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 6, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Hing-Tung Tony Wu, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Wu to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. HING-TUNG TONY WU
                                          ("Dr. Wu")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Wu, certificate of registration number 30054, am a member of the
                  College. I recognize that the College has required me to participate in a
                  Specified Continuing Educational or Remediation Program.    

            (3)   I, Dr. Wu, am ceasing to practise medicine due to retirement prior to
                  completing the Specified Continuing Educational or Remediation Program.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (1)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (4)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake that, upon the Effective Date, I will not practise
                  medicine in any jurisdiction until each and every one of the following
                  conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake that upon the Effective Date I shall forward a
                  request to the General Manager of the OHIP that my billing number be
                  deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and
                  before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in
                  accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (6)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (7)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practice, the College may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (11)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (13)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that this Undertaking shall be posted on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (14)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Wu has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to
                        retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any
                        medical advice or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate
                  enquiries of OHIP and any person who or institution that may have
                  relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hing-Tung Tony Wu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 6, 2017:

Dr. Wu has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)