Wu, Howard (CPSO#: 67746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Apr 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smart Health Medical Clinic
Unit 9
4080 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 4C3
Phone: (905) 948-9738
Fax: (905) 948-9740
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wu ( CPSO# 67746 )

Business Address:
Smart Health Medical Clinic
Unit 9
4080 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON  L3R 4C3
Phone Number: (905) 948-9738

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2002
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 25 Apr 2009
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 29 Apr 2013
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 08 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 8, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.  Howard Wu, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Wu to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                             DR. HOWARD WU
                                              ("Dr. Wu")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Wu, certificate of registration number 67746, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that I was the subject of a reassessment of my
                  family practice arising from an Order of the Discipline Committee of the
                  College dated April 29, 2013 (the "Reassessment").

            (4)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that, upon receiving an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to take no further
                  action in respect of the Reassessment.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking from
                  the date on which I sign it. 

            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College, who is fluent in both
                        Cantonese and Mandarin Chinese (the "Clinical Supervisor"), as set
                        out below:

                        (i)   Once a month, for a minimum period of four months, the
                              Clinical Supervisor will observe a half day of my practice
                              and will review the patient charts of the patients whose care
                              s/he has observed me providing. This will involve a minimum
                              of either 10 patients or three hours of observation. The
                              Clinical Supervisor will meet with me to discuss my
                              management of those patients as well as any charting issues.
                              The Clinical Supervisor will report to the College following
                              each direct observation and meeting with me described in this
                              paragraph; 
                  
                        (ii)  Once a month during the same four month period, the Clinical
                              Supervisor will review a minimum of 15 charts to assess the
                              quality of my documentation and care. The Clinical Supervisor
                              will also meet with me to address my educational needs,
                              including needs with respect to infection control/ hygiene,
                              record-keeping and use of templates, prescribing of
                              antibiotics, use of medical assistants, routine preventive
                              testing, performance of investigations when not clinically
                              indicated and appropriate billing. The Clinical Supervisor
                              will report to the College every month on this chart review
                              and meeting; 
                  
                        (iii) The meetings with my Clinical Supervisor in (i) and (ii)
                              above will alternate every two weeks. The report for each
                              meeting will be due monthly;
                  
                        (iv)  After four months, upon the recommendation of the Clinical
                              Supervisor and the approval of the College, the direct
                              patient observation by the Clinical Supervisor shall cease.
                              The Clinical Supervisor will continue to review a minimum of
                              15 patient charts and meet with me to address my educational
                              needs on a monthly basis, and will report to the College on a
                              monthly basis;
                  
                        (v)   After a total of 12 months of Clinical Supervision, if
                              recommended by the Clinical Supervisor and approved by the
                              College, the Clinical Supervision shall cease.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wu, further acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand, in addition to the above, what is required of the
                        Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Engage in the supervision described in (a) above;
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (iv)  Review various infection control and other policies and
                              guidelines relevant to my practice with me; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College as set out above, or
                              more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns
                              about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the reports of the assessor dated March 18, 2015 and
                        May 29, 2015, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Wu, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Wu, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in medical record
                              keeping, or proof of successful completion of an acceptable
                              medical record keeping course and follow up assignments; and
                  
                        (ii)  review Anti-infective Guidelines for Community-acquired
                              Infections:
                              http://www.mumshealth.com/guidelines-tools/anti-infective
                  
                        (iii) 2-4 page written summary of pharmacologic current management
                              of anxiety including the role of hypnotics
                  
                        (iv)  2-4 page written summary of management of vaginal bleeding in
                              pregnancy "RCOG Antepartum hemorrhage:
                              https://www.rcog.org.uk/en/guidelines-research-services/guidelines/gtg6
                  
                        (v)   review CPSO Medical Records Policy with a written summary of
                              those areas upon which Dr. Wu has taken action:
                              www.cpso.on.ca/uploadedFiles/policies/policies/policyitems/medicalrecords.pdf 
                  
                        (vi)  review Infection Prevention and Control for Clinical Office
                              Practice with a written summary of those areas upon which Dr.
                              Wu has taken action:
                              http://www.publichealthontario.ca/en/eRepository/IPAC_Clinical_Office_Practice_2013.pdf 
                  
                        (vii) review the Practice Guide: Medical Professionalism and
                              College Policies:
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/The-Practice-Guide-Medical-Professionalism-and-Col
                  
                        (viii)Any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                        (ix)  Demonstration of participation in and compliance with a
                              recognized educational tracking program through the CFPC or
                              GPPA
                  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out above
                        in section (7)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that upon the College's request I may be
                        required to provide a report or reports to the College regarding my
                        progress and compliance with the professional education set out in
                        section (7)(a).
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (3) above
                        and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College. The
                        review of charts will be for a period beginning on a date after
                        clinical supervision has concluded, onwards.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the  College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice
                        at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP")
                        and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information,
                        in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the
                        provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                        attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Wu, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge that
                  a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act
                  of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a
                  referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of
                  all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation
                  of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that the following summary will also appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Wu was the subject of a College investigation into his standard
                        of practice. As a result of the investigation: 
                  
                              *     "Dr. Wu will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum 12
                                    months;
                  
                              *     "Dr. Wu will engage in professional education in
                                    medical record-keeping and infection control; and
                  
                              *     "Dr. Wu's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College approximately 6 months after
                                    the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (7) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out in section (7) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        education set out at section (7) above and which he or she
                        reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            As from February 2, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Howard Wu, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Wu to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                             DR. HOWARD WU
                                              ("Dr. Wu")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Wu, certificate of registration number 67746, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that I am the subject of a restriction on my
                  prescribing arising from an Order of the Discipline Committee of the
                  College dated April 29, 2013 (the "Discipline Committee Order").

            (4)   Dr. Wu, acknowledge and agree that this Undertaking supplements and
                  operates in conjunction with the Discipline Committee Order.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking from
                  the date on which I sign it. 

            (6)   Monitored Drugs
                  (a)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake that in addition to the Order of the
                        Discipline Committee dated April 29, 2013 that requires that I not
                        prescribe narcotics or controlled substances, I will cease to
                        prescribe all other monitored drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                        Safety and Awareness Act, 2012, c. 22, as noted in Appendix ``A``
                        to this Undertaking, and as amended from time to time).
                  
             (7)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Wu, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge that
                  a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act
                  of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a
                  referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of
                  all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation
                  of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Wu, acknowledge that the following summary will also appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        In addition to his previous Discipline Committee order that
                        prohibits Dr. Wu from prescribing  narcotics and controlled
                        substances, Dr. Wu  shall not prescribe monitored substances.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all assessors who may at any time assess my
                  practice upon request of the College ("Assessors"):

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Wu, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking; and/or
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  
            As from 11:59 p.m., April 29, 2013, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Howard Wu:

                  (a)   Dr. Wu shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                        prescriptions for any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under
                              the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); and
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19)
                  
                        (collectively referred to as the "Restricted Substances")
                  
                  (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of
                  Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached to the Order as Schedule
                  "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached to the Order as
                  Schedule "B")
                  
                  (b)   Dr. Wu shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the
                        form set out at Schedule "C" [to the Order].  For further clarity,
                        this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Wu cannot prescribe Narcotic
                        Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
                        Other Targeted Substances."  A sign reflecting this restriction
                        will also be posted in Chinese.
                  
                  (c)   Dr. Wu shall not delegate to any other person any Controlled Act as
                        that term is defined in the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991. 
                  
                  (d)   Approximately one month after the completion of the suspension
                        required by paragraph 3 of this Order, Dr. Wu shall undergo an
                        assessment of his family practice by a College-appointed assessor
                        (the "Assessor(s)") at his expense.  
                        The Assessor(s) shall report the results of the assessment to the
                        College.  Dr. Wu shall abide by any recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s).
                  
                  (e)   Dr. Wu shall consent to the sharing of information between the
                        Assessor(s) and the College as any of them deem necessary or
                        desirable in order to fulfill their respective obligations.
                  
                  (f)   Dr. Wu shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his office
                        practice and patient charts by the College for the purpose of
                        monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this
                        Order and will make his OHIP billings accessible to the College for
                        this purpose.
                  
                  
            As from 12:01 a.m., April 25, 2009, by Order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Howard Wu:  

                  (a)   Dr. Howard Wu is prohibited from performing any nerve blocks in his
                        medical practice;
                  
                  (b)   Dr. Howard Wu will provide a signed consent allowing the College to
                        have access to his OHIP billings;
                  
                  (c)   Dr. Howard Wu shall submit to and not interfere with unannounced
                        inspections of his office(s) and practice(s) and patient charts by
                        a College representative for the purposes of monitoring and
                        enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. If
                        monitoring reports are satisfactory to the College and compliance
                        demonstrated, monitoring shall cease after a period of 5 years;
                  
                  (d)   Dr. Howard Wu shall post a sign, in a visible location in his
                        office, in both Chinese and English, that he is prohibited by the
                        College from performing nerve blocks, and that a signed consent be
                        enclosed in each patient's chart, that they have been informed of
                        this restriction;
                  
                  (e)   Dr. Howard Wu will have a monitor present for all chronic pain
                        patients, at his own expense and pursuant to the following terms:
                  
                        (i)     That the monitor shall be a member of a health profession
                                pursuant to the terms of the Regulated Health Professions
                                Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18, who is aware of the terms of
                                the Order and acceptable to the College;
                  
                        (ii)    That the monitor keep a log of all chronic pain patients
                                seen, and    submits this to the College quarterly with a
                                written report on Dr. Wu's conduct;
                  
                        (iii)   That the monitor signs and dates contemporaneously the
                                corresponding entry in the medical record;
                  
                        (iv)    That monitoring may cease two years from the date of this
                                Order providing the College is satisfied that Dr. Wu has
                                been compliant with this Order.
                  
            NOTE: As of May 19, 2011, term and condition (e) above ceases to be in effect. 

            As from April 5, 2002, Dr. Howard Wu undertakes to the College of Physicians
            and Surgeons of Ontario not to perform any nerve blocks in his practice of
            medicine.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Apr 2013
Summary:

On April 29, 2013, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Howard Wu committed acts of professional misconduct in that,   
he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and, he engaged in an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would  
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The 
Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Wu is incompetent. 
 
Dr. Wu is a family physician practising in Markham. As a result of five investigations into his 
practice, the ICRC referred allegations to the Discipline Committee by notices of hearing dated 
July 6, 2011 and September 5, 2012. 
 
On July 27, 2011, Dr. Wu signed an Undertaking not to prescribe narcotics or other controlled 
substances (Restricted Substances), subject to the engagement of a College-approved Clinical 
Supervisor. Following an investigation into Dr. Wu's compliance with the Undertaking, the 
ICRC referred an additional allegation of disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct 
by breaching his Undertaking to the Discipline Committee by notice of hearing dated April 4, 
2013. 
 
Dr. Wu admitted that: 
 
            he failed to maintain the standard of practice and is incompetent in his chronic 
            pain practice in relation to forty charts as detailed in the reports of the medical 
            assessors. 
 
            he failed to maintain the standard of practice in his family practice in relation to 
            five charts, as detailed in the report of a medical assessor. 
 
            he failed to maintain the standard of practice and engaged in disgraceful, 
            dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to his delegation of 
            controlled acts in relation to three charts as detailed in the report of a medical 
            assessor. 
 
            he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by breaching 
            his Undertaking as follows: 
 
      a)    by issuing a prescription for Testosterone on August 10, 2011 before engaging a 
            Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College; 
 
      b)    between June 2012 until October/November 2012 by failing to ensure his Clinical 
            Supervisor co-signed patient charts to indicate he approved of the prescription for 
            each and every Restricted Substance prescription issued by Dr. Wu;    
       
      c)    by failing to ensure the charts co-signed by his Clinical Supervisor for two 
            patients on December 4, 2012 accurately reflected the prescriptions issued to the 
            patients; and 
 
      d)    by failing to include required information in his log pertaining to prescriptions for 
            Restricted Substances in relation to five patients. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
            The Registrar suspend Dr. Wu's certificate of registration for a period of six (6) 
            months commencing June 1, 2013. 
 
            The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wu's 
            certificate of registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Wu shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of 
            the following substances: 
 
            (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
            (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under 
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
            (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and 
                  Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); and 
 
            (iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines 
                  and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled 
                  Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) 
 
            (collectively referred to as the "Restricted Substances") 
 
      (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of 
      Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule "A" [to the Order]; and 
      the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule "B") 
 
      (b)   Dr. Wu shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the form set out at 
            Schedule "C" [to the Order].  For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
            "Dr. Wu cannot prescribe Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled 
            Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances."  A sign reflecting this 
            restriction will also be posted in Chinese. 
 
      (c)   Dr. Wu shall not delegate to any other person any Controlled Act as that term is 
            defined in the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991.  
 
 
 
              
(d)   Approximately one month after the completion of the suspension required by 
      paragraph 3 of this Order, Dr. Wu shall undergo an assessment of his family 
      practice by a College-appointed assessor (the "Assessor(s)") at his expense.   
      The Assessor(s) shall report the results of the assessment to the College.  Dr. Wu 
      shall abide by any recommendations of the Assessor(s). 
              
(e)   Dr. Wu shall consent to the sharing of information between the Assessor(s) and 
      the College as any of them deem necessary or desirable in order to fulfill their 
      respective obligations. 
              
(f)   Dr. Wu shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his office practice and 
      patient charts by the College for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his 
      compliance with the terms of this Order and will make his OHIP billings 
      accessible to the College for this purpose. 
              
      Dr. Wu appear before the panel to be reprimanded.   
              
      Dr. Wu to pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days 
      from the date of this Order. 
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 29, 2013


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Jan 2009
Summary:

On January 12, 2009, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Wu s admission and found that he 
engaged in acts of professional misconduct by contravening a term, condition and limitation on 
his certificate of registration and by engaging in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct by breaching an April 2002 undertaking to not perform nerve blocks in his practice of 
medicine. 
 
On April 24, 2009, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:     
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Wu s certificate of registration for a period of six months to 
      commence within 60 days of this order, two months of which shall be suspended upon 
      Dr. Wu s successful completion, at his own expense, of the College s Medical Ethics and 
      Informed Consent Course.  
 
2.    That the following terms, conditions and limitations be imposed on Dr. Wu s certificate 
      of registration: 
 
      (a)   That Dr. Wu be prohibited from performing any nerve blocks in his medical 
            practice; 
 
      (b)   That Dr. Wu provide a signed consent allowing the College to have access to his 
            OHIP billings; 
 
      (c)   That Dr. Wu shall submit to and not interfere with unannounced inspections of his 
            office(s) and practice(s) and patient charts by a College representative for the 
            purposes of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. 
            If monitoring reports are satisfactory to the College and compliance demonstrated, 
            monitoring shall cease after a period of 5 years; 
 
      (d)   That Dr. Wu post a sign, in a visible location in his office, in both Chinese and 
            English, that he is prohibited by the College from performing nerve blocks, and 
            that a signed consent be enclosed in each patient s chart, that they have been 
            informed of this restriction; 
 
      (e)   That Dr. Wu will have a monitor present for all chronic pain patients, at his own 
            expense and pursuant to the following terms: 
 
            (i)   That the monitor shall be a member of a health profession pursuant to the 
                  terms of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18, who 
                  is aware of the terms of the Order and acceptable to the College; 
 
            (ii)  That the monitor keep a log of all chronic pain patients seen, and    
                  submits this to the College quarterly with a written report on Dr. Wu s 
                  conduct; 
 
            (iii) That the monitor signs and dates contemporaneously the corresponding 
                  entry in the medical record; 
 
            (iv)  That monitoring may cease two years from the date of this Order providing 
                  the College is satisfied that Dr. Wu has been compliant with this Order. 
3.    Dr. Wu shall appear before the Committee to be reprimanded, and results of this 
      proceeding shall be included on the register. 
 
4.    Dr. Wu shall pay costs to the College of $3,650 within 60 days of the date of this Order. 
 
  
 
  
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 12, 2009

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Howard Wu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 8, 2016:

Dr. Wu was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:
• Dr. Wu will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum 12 months;
• Dr. Wu will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping and infection control; and
• Dr. Wu’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: Member
Active Date: February 2, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Howard Wu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 2, 2016:

In addition to his previous Discipline Committee order that prohibits Dr. Wu from prescribing narcotics and controlled substances, Dr. Wu shall not prescribe monitored substances.