Wu, Jackson Sai-Yiu (CPSO#: 72981)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002