Wu, John Kang-Min (CPSO#: 61482)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2010