Wu, Louis (CPSO#: 68969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dundas Centre Medical X-Ray and US
Suite 402
220 Dundas St W
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Canada
Phone: 905-430-1781
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Bloor Christie X-Ray and Ultrasound
716 Bloor St W
Toronto ON  M6G 1L4
Canada
Phone: 416-588-5937
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Niagara Falls X-Ray and Ultrasound
Suite 1
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Canada
Phone: 905-374-1686
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Kennedy Eglinton X-Ray and US
Lower Level
2374 Eglington Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1K 2P4
Canada
Phone: 416-757-8497
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Finchgate X-Ray and Ultrasound
Suite 320
40 Finchgate Blvd
Bramalea ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: 905-792-8440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Heartlake X-Ray and Ultrasound
Suite 104
10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton ON  L6Z 0A4
Canada
Phone: 905-846-7733
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Lawrence Park X-Ray and Ultrasound
Unit 25B
508 Lawrence Ave W
Toronto ON  M6A 1A1
Canada
Phone: 416-787-0229
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wu ( CPSO# 68969 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
220 Dundas Street West
Suite 402
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 430-1781

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2001