Wu, Nancy Pearl (CPSO#: 94603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
80 Scollard Street
Toronto ON  M5R 1G2
Phone: (416) 889-0334
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Apr 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Nancy  Pearl  Wu may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine,
            only.