Wu, Paul Tze Kuen (CPSO#: 43566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1455 Lakeshore Road
Unit G14A
Burlington ON  L7S 2J1
Phone: (905) 681-1553
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wu ( CPSO# 43566 )

Business Address:
G14 - 1455 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 2J1
Phone Number: (905) 681-1553

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 May 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL TZE KUEN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986