Wu, Robert Clark (CPSO#: 70088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 E N - 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4567
Fax: (416) 595-5826
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gershon and Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gershon ( CPSO# 70115 )
Dr. R. Wu ( CPSO# 70088 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G1 06
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4758

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
14 E N - 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CLARK WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000